Richards, Tanya Claire
Isleworth
Status:
Active
Notified: 31/05/2021
Date of Birth: 04/1971
Occupation: Group Financial Controller
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Shingleton, Barnaby
Isleworth, Middlesex
Status:
Active
Notified: 01/02/2022
Date of Birth: 01/1975
Occupation: Television Executive
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Sky Corporate Secretary Limited,
Isleworth, Middlesex, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 24/06/2020
Role: Secretary
Wedlock, Paul
Isleworth
Status:
Active
Notified: 01/02/2022
Date of Birth: 12/1982
Occupation: Finance Director, Uki Controller
Role: Director
Country of Residence: Scotland
Nationality: British
Beattie, Anna Rachael
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 01/11/2005
Ceased: 03/10/2017
Occupation: Tv Producer
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Robson, Simon
Isleworth
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 31/05/2021
Ceased: 01/02/2022
Occupation: Group Cfo
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British