Afifi, Ahmed
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 29/06/2022
Date of Birth: 10/1985
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: Egyptian
Ashworth, Michael John
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 17/05/2016
Date of Birth: 12/1961
Occupation: Oil Company Executive
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Burdge, Huw Edward James
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 22/03/2024
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Pecten Secretaries Limited,
Birmingham, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 01/11/2022
Role: Secretary
Lenk, Karl Eugene
London, England
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 04/07/2019
Ceased: 22/03/2024
Date of Birth: 05/1974
Occupation: Egm Afm, Tanzania
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British