Aviva Company Secretarial Services Limited,
London
Status:
Active
Notified: 27/11/2015
Role: Secretary
Nationality: British
Herriott, Charles William Grant
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 27/11/2023
Occupation: Investment Manager
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Shervell, Ian
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 26/02/2021
Date of Birth: 10/1978
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Callen, Jason Douglas
London
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 31/05/2006
Ceased: 27/11/2015
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British