Berglund, Martin
Bournemouth, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 15/12/2023
Occupation: Chief Financial Officer
Role: Director
Country of Residence: Sweden
Nationality: Swedish
Haworth, Russell Adam
Bournemouth, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 04/01/2023
Date of Birth: 09/1971
Occupation: Company Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Beurier, Stefan
1 Wilder Walk, London, United Kingdom
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 25/04/2016
Ceased: 10/12/2020
Occupation: Chief Financial Officer
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: French
Engman, Johnny
Bournemouth, United Kingdom
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 17/03/2021
Ceased: 15/12/2023
Date of Birth: 04/1977
Occupation: Cfo
Role: Director
Country of Residence: Sweden
Nationality: Swedish
Gradden, Amanda Jane
1 Wilder Walk, London, United Kingdom
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 02/01/2013
Ceased: 17/03/2021
Occupation: Company Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Painter, Duncan Anthony
1 Wilder Walk, London, United Kingdom
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 11/10/2012
Ceased: 17/03/2021
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Smith, Colin
Bournemouth, United Kingdom
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 17/03/2021
Ceased: 21/07/2022
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British