Gifon, Elena
London, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 28/01/2022
Date of Birth: 12/1976
Occupation: Emea Controller
Role: Director
Country of Residence: Switzerland
Nationality: German
Holden, Guy Fraser
London, England
Status:
Active
Notified: 15/04/2021
Date of Birth: 03/1962
Occupation: Chartered Surveyor
Role: Director
Country of Residence: England
Nationality: British
Naftis, Alex Constantinos
London, England
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 15/04/2021
Ceased: 27/09/2023
Role: Secretary
Pullen, Matthew Barrington
10 Paternoster Row, London
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 01/08/2008
Ceased: 05/11/2012
Occupation: Chartered Surveyor
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British