Holman, Hannah
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 17/05/2023
Date of Birth: 05/1980
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Peach, Oliver Matthew
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 03/11/2021
Role: Secretary
Everett, Vikki Louise
200 Aldersgate Street, London, United Kingdom
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 04/06/2018
Ceased: 11/03/2024
Date of Birth: 12/1971
Occupation: Project Manager
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
O'Brien, Kirsty
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 11/03/2024
Ceased: 03/08/2022
Occupation: Director, Investment Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British