Holman, Hannah
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 01/11/2021
Date of Birth: 05/1980
Occupation: Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Peach, Oliver Matthew
London, United Kingdom
Status:
Active
Notified: 28/10/2021
Role: Secretary
Everett, Vikki Louise
200 Aldersgate Street, London, United Kingdom
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 28/05/2019
Ceased: 11/03/2024
Date of Birth: 12/1971
Occupation: Project Manager
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
O'Brien, Kirsty
200 Aldersgate Street, London, United Kingdom
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 30/04/2019
Ceased: 09/12/2022
Occupation: Director, Operations Manager
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British
Riddelsdell, Robert Michael
Ashtead
Status:
Ceased
Notified: 21/02/2005
Ceased: 11/11/2005
Occupation: Company Director
Role: Director
Country of Residence: United Kingdom
Nationality: British